BOSOM FRIENDS (BRADFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide help, support and friendship to women living with and beyond breast cancer. We meet on the 3rd Wednesday of each month at 7pm at the Cancer Support Centre on Smith Lane. Meetings are lively social events with pamper sessions, talks, visits and cosmetic/clothes parties, but always with time to talk. Our big event of the year is the fashion show, when all women models are from the group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bradford City
Governance
- 15 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA BARTLE | Chair | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ania Kaminska | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robina Amin | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Carrington | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Asquith | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ostick | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julia Frances Sunderland | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DEPLEDGE | Trustee | 21 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.76k | £3.71k | £11.88k | £16.59k | £13.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.50k | £5.31k | £5.89k | £16.99k | £12.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND SUPPORT TO PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE BREAST CANCER PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN UNDER TREATMENT WITHIN THE BRADFORD HEALTH AUTHORITY AREA AND WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, IMFIRMED OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT ASSOCIATED CHARITABLE WORK.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
497 Leeds Road
Idle
BRADFORD
BD10 8LD
- Phone:
- 01274618982
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window