WOMB TRANSPLANT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to further research into Womb Transplantation, as well as other Fertility Sparing Surgical Procedures, by raising money for a clinical programme which would fully fund women wishing to undergo the procedure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2010: Standard registration
- UTERINE TRANSPLANT UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Benjamin Peter Jones | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Quiroga - Giraldez | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DR MEEN-YAU THUM | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SRDJAN SASO | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KEITH STAFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.35k | £6.14k | £762 | £67.07k | £28.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | £384 | £22.16k | £12.25k | £92.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 169 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 252 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2013
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY UNDERTAKING MEDICAL RESEARCH IN CONNECTION WITH FERTILITY PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION WITHIN WOMEN AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND (II) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM INFERTILITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND OTHER ASSISTANCE, AND (III) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILLIAM STURGES SOLICITORS
14-16 CAXTON STREET
LONDON
SW1H 0QY
- Phone:
- 02078731082
- Email:
- admin@wombtransplantuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window