Financial history THURCROFT WELFARE COMMUNITY HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1142017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.93k £55.75k £70.56k £55.18k £53.79k
Total expenditure £54.52k £36.76k £83.94k £62.79k £50.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.64k £9.52k N/A N/A