THE KALAHARI BUSHMEN SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collection of funds and items for resale in order to provide support to Kalahari Bushmen in form of schooling, buying land and seeds for crops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Namibia
Governance
- 05 October 2010: Standard registration
- 09 April 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.12k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.43k | £4.18k | £880 | £2.69k | £30 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 13 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 27 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 17 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF KALAHARI BUSHMEN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE TRADITIONS OF THE INDIGENOUS AFRICAN TRIBES OF THE KALAHARI AND THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THOSE TRADITIONS IN THE PROCESS OF TRANSITION FROM TRIBAL LIFE TO LIVING IN A MODERN SOCIETY."
Area of benefit
KALAHARI
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window