RICHMOND AND HOUNSLOW CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is an association of churches grouped together in a geographical area. The charity provides administration services and support for each of the churches within the circuit. In addition, the charity is also responsible for helping the wider community, which it does through a variety of donations to various charities and good causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

35 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 10 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Anne Dalton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Deacon Richard David Goldstraw | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Weeks | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Heflin Jani | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Penney | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen John Haines Ludlow | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Bismarck Laryea | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
FRANCES MARY MOORHOUSE | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Deacon Katherine Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev GEOFFREY FARRAR | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Charles Oppong-Akuoko | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Moses Tandayi | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ADAM NYAWO | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Ian Haddow | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
KUMARI RAJINI MUTHUKUMAR | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY WATERHOUSE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Thomas Logan | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Mary McMahon | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MRS MARY PATTERSON | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Rev NICOLA MORRISON | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN ROBERT LOGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr MARGARET NORAH MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS GILL SPARKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LYNETH FRIDAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MISS WIN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR ALAN HOUSDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
VALERIE MARY HEARN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARGARET ANN LOGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BRENDAN DEAN WASMUTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CAROL ANN POWERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JEAN FLANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANET EMILY WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JEAN ANN BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ARULAMPALAM CHARLES RAJKUMAR | Trustee |
|
||||||||
VIVIEN NORMA ISAAC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63m | £1.91m | £1.30m | £278.17k | £246.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £327.74k | £343.83k | £538.84k | £422.93k | £1.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.79k | £2.12k | £2.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £224.16k | £198.00k | £233.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £45.29k | £53.26k | £46.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £1.33m | £1.65m | £1.02m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £327.48k | £343.67k | £536.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £262 | £165 | £2.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.29k | £0 | £7.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £262 | £0 | £2.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Richmond & Hounslow Circuit Office
Hounslow Methodist Church
Bell Road
Hounslow
TW3 3PB
- Phone:
- 02085689975
- Email:
- margaret@rhmc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window