WIMBLEDON CIRCUIT (THE METHODIST CHURCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian Religion through the support of the six Churches making up the Wimbledon Circuit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

34 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Merton
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
34 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND PAUL DOUGLAS TIMMIS | Chair |
|
||||||
Paula Bridger | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Alison Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Giraud | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ashcroft | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Draper | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Grasby | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Proctor | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Gwenda Carpenter | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Tony Loft | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Meineck | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Dawn Nicola Canham | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Carpenter | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Johnson | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roy Newitt | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE PANTER | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Charlton | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND EMMA CUSACK | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
DENISE GOULD | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marion Baker | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pam Slater | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pat Petley | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charlton | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cannon | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE MORTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARY LINTON-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ANNE MEINECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH JOYCE REDWAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAWN DOWNES | Trustee |
|
||||||
WENDY MARGARET SIEMASZKO | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID JAMES PICKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.86k | £192.45k | £185.02k | £183.90k | £192.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.97k | £179.56k | £169.95k | £172.84k | £183.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Kingsmead Avenue
WORCESTER PARK
Surrey
KT4 8UT
- Phone:
- 02083372348
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window