Trustees AIRE AND CALDER METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

101 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev BARRY OWEN Chair 17 September 2013
TRINITY MISSION CASTLEFORD CIO
Received: On time
Rev Julian Pursehouse Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Paula Ridley Trustee 07 June 2024
None on record
Heather Turner Trustee 07 June 2024
THE METHODIST CHURCH YORKSHIRE WEST DISTRICT
Received: 103 days late
WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1555 days
HORBURY CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: On time
Nicola Hobson Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Hilary Hetherington Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Christine Whitworth Trustee 01 September 2023
CHARITIES OF HANNAH PICKARD
Received: On time
Helen Gourlay Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Malcolm Bullock Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Susan Dean Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Janet Atack Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Rev Andrew Atkins Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
TOM FERGUSON Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
STEPHEN HINDLE Trustee 01 March 2021
TRINITY MISSION CASTLEFORD CIO
Received: On time
KEITH JONES Trustee 01 March 2021
The Friends of the Keighley and Worth Valley Railway
Received: On time
Katherine Ann Swales Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Julie Copley Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Rosalyn Ann Field Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Brian Andrew Hill Trustee 01 September 2020
CHARITIES OF HANNAH PICKARD
Received: On time
Carole Mary Shaw Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record