SHILDON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE'S ACTION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Co-ordinate activities and opportunities for children and young people within Shildon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Nelson Mrs | Chair | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY ELIZABETH PATRICIA WHARTON | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Townsend | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||
DERRICK ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.79k | £8.80k | £10.00k | £31.87k | £45.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.07k | £5.60k | £7.53k | £7.79k | £25.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO LIVE, PLAY OR ACCESS SERVICES IN SHILDON AND SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROMOTION OF INITIATIVES THAT ADDRESS THEIR EXPRESSED NEEDS AND ASPIRATIONS 2 TO DEVELOP AND PROMOTE COMMUNICATION, PARTNERSHIP WORKING AND BEST PRACTICE BETWEEN VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY AGENCIES WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SHILDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
SHILDON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHILDON TOWN COUNCIL
CIVIC CENTRE SQUARE
MAIN STREET
SHILDON
DL4 1AH
- Phone:
- 01388 772563
- Email:
- k.regan@shildon.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window