OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is responsible for promoting and assisting education in the Diocese consistent with the faith and practice of the Church of England;religious education and worship in schools; and the open admissions policy of the Diocese of Oxford. It also exists to advise governors and promote co-operation between those concerned with education in the Diocese.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,987,000
Donations and legacies | £3.97m | |
Charitable activities | £886.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £126.00k | |
Other | £3.00k |
Total expenditure:
£6,328,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£41,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,150,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.33m |
People

21 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
900 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 20 January 2010: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Funds received from 307913 OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JASON PAUL ST JOHN NICOLLE | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rev Samuel Christopher Ferris | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Michael George Mill | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Sharron Tulle Marland | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Alison Jane McBride | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Vivienne Angela Lister | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rebecca Jane Morris | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
The Rt Revd Gavin Andrew Collins | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
PETER FLORY | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Chris Tomes | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Hannah Joyce Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Matthew Geoffrey Abbott | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
TREFOR WILMOT LLEWELLYN | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Lorna Mary Piper | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Dr Felix Charles Penrice Leach | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
PATRICIA ANN HUDSON | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
THE RIGHT REVD DR STEVEN JOHN LINDSEY CROFT | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
PETER ROSS NORMAN | Trustee | 27 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
KATHY WINROW | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rev MARK DAVID BENNET | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rev TIMOTHY JAMES LINCOLN HARPER | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66m | £5.43m | £5.01m | £6.02m | £5.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71m | £4.05m | £5.07m | £4.99m | £6.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.28m | £3.15m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £823.00k | £4.66m | £4.14m | £5.06m | £3.97m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £822.00k | £750.00k | £854.00k | £892.00k | £886.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.00k | £16.00k | £13.00k | £65.00k | £126.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.71m | £4.05m | £5.07m | £4.99m | £6.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.00k | £16.00k | £22.00k | £21.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.00k | £7.00k | £4.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £398.00k | £426.00k | £487.00k | £430.00k | £471.00k | |
|
Other assets | £1.59m | £2.86m | £2.95m | £3.76m | £4.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £773.00k | £667.00k | £807.00k | £586.00k | £2.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/11/2009
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE DIOCESE, BEING EDUCATION WHICH IS CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND 2 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND RELIGIOUS WORSHIP IN SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE 3 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF CHURCH SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE AND TO ADVISE THE GOVERNORS OF SUCH SCHOOLS AND TRUSTEES OF CHURCH EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENTS AND ANY OTHER BODY OR PERSON CONCERNED ON ANY MATTER AFFECTING CHURCH SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE 4 TO PROMOTE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE BOARD AND BODIES OR PERSONS CONCERNED IN ANY RESPECT WITH EDUCATION IN THE DIOCESEE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HOUSE OXFORD
LANGFORD LOCKS
KIDLINGTON
OXFORD
OX5 1GF
- Phone:
- 01865208200
- Email:
- schools@oxford.anglican.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window