SOMERSET MENDIP CIRCUIT - METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Preaching Plan for Ministers, Local Preachers & others to take Services in the Circuit's churches. Provides & maintains 4 manses for Ministers and provides Pastoral Care for all. Organises voluntary payments by Churches to help pay costs of Stipends, wages, District Assessment etc. Holds regular Circuit & Leadership Meetings, to communicate information & monitor progress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£803,493
Donations and legacies | £20.00k | |
Charitable activities | £736.83k | |
Other trading activities | £9.82k | |
Investments | £31.94k | |
Other | £4.91k |
Total expenditure:
£529,774
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £529.77k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £529.77k | |
Retained for future use | £273.72k |
People

5 Employee(s)
51 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
51 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tina Swire | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Powell | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Andrew Prout | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Leanne Katie Hibberd | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Colin Luke Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Alistair Vivian Charles Bolt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Eileen Joyce Westlake | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Margaret Crawshaw | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Jill Paricia Warren | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
MALCOLM JOHN GALE | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Albert Henry Holland BEM | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Anne Storrier | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bethan Mair Foister | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Barry William King | Trustee | 31 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANGELA LUCY WITTLETON | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
professor Gordon John Taylor | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Christopher John Clarke | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Eric Julian Small | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Celia Rachel Keady | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stuart Martin Seel | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Katherine Jane Laws | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jaqueline Ann Young | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Val Creed | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Maureen Mary Rendell | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Margaret Anne Speddings | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Kenneth Barry Speddings | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert Kenneth Young | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Barry Sparks | Trustee | 06 August 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Brian John Davidson | Trustee | 06 August 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tony Stevenson | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Marion Eva Jefferies | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Helen Anita Wade | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lois Emm | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
JACQUELINE JOY COBB | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
RUTH THOMAS | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
MOIRA JOY DUCHAR COWELL | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
Deborah Ann Towner | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN THOMAS BATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
VIV SQUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
IRIS BETTY BELSTEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ROBERT WILLIAM HASKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
KEN HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
KATIE WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
RAY NOEL WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MALCOLM BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
RICHARD JOHN PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
STEVE DERBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ELAINE MARY HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
BILL JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
EDITH HADDIE CHANNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Judith Cole | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £553.66k | £596.56k | £229.20k | £490.95k | £803.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £399.43k | £478.94k | £375.09k | £396.86k | £529.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.95k | £10.09k | N/A | N/A | £9.82k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £736.83k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.87k | £7.36k | N/A | N/A | £31.94k | |
|
Income - Other | £534.84k | £579.11k | N/A | N/A | £4.91k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £399.43k | £478.94k | N/A | N/A | £529.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £7.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.78m | £1.50m | N/A | N/A | £1.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.83k | £0 | N/A | N/A | £8.17k | |
|
Other assets | £637.80k | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | £826.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £49.06k | £51.66k | N/A | N/A | £47.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1939), METHODIST CHURCH FUNDS ACT (1960) AND DEED OF UNION (1932)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 FARMHOUSE DRIVE
FROME
BA11 2SR
- Phone:
- 01373466998
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window