HANNEY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1135266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hanney Youth FC was set up in 2006 to encourage local children to learn and enjoy playing football. The emphasis within the club is to include all abilities, both boys and girls from age 5 to 16 and to have fun while learning the skills of football. The club play in the Oxford Mail Boys League and currently have 3 teams (Rising Stars, U10 7 U16) and welcome new players and parents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £11,908
Total expenditure: £13,050

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Lewis Davies Chair 26 March 2025
None on record
David James Carter Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Rebecca Lawson Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Carina Smith Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Christopher Spindloe Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Bourton Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record
PAUL ARAM Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.83k £14.66k £21.80k £21.32k £11.91k
Total expenditure £21.09k £13.45k £18.28k £21.14k £13.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.02k N/A £160 £102 £4.53k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Nobles Close
Grove
WANTAGE
OX12 0NR
Phone:
07801208351