Financial history THE GREEN ROOM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1134766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2019 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023
Total gross income £1.35m £1.16m £891.74k £2.27k £1.05m
Total expenditure £557.46k £1.07m £917.62k £1.15m £1.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.32m £1.14m £887.50k N/A £1.04m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £26.27k £16.28k £4.24k N/A £10.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £544.34k £1.06m £860.92k N/A £1.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £49.98k N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.59k £2.46k £0 N/A £509
Expenditure - Grants institution £540.75k £1.06m £0 N/A £1.17m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £13.12k £4.31k £6.71k N/A £0