BLACK FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make charitable donations, particularly for the advancement of education, by: Assisting in building and providing facilities to schools in developing countries, Providing bursaries and awards for school pupils and students in further and higher education, Promotion of research, Relief of poverty and Advancement of health by prevention or relief of sickness, disease or human suffering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr THOMAS JOSEPH BLACK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDRA ANN D'Souza | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMILY ROSE AYRES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN BLACK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49k | £2.27k | £3.78k | £2.93k | £2.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.41k | £60.96k | £44.96k | £50.53k | £20.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 25 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO PAY THEM TO SUCH CHARITY OR APPLY THEM FOR SUCH OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') IN EACH CASE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY 1.1 ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SCHOOLS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SCHOOLS IN SUCH COUNTRIES 1.2 PROVIDING BURSARIES TO SCHOOL PUPILS AND STUDENTS AT FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS ON GROUNDS OF MEANS TESTED FINANCIAL NEED 1.3 PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES AND AWARDS TO SCHOOL PUPILS AND STUDENTS AT FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS ON THE GROUNDS OF ASSESSED MERIT, DISTINCTION OR PROFICIENCY IN STUDIES OR SPORT; AND 1.4 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH 2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACK FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
PO BOX 232
PETERSFIELD
GU32 9DQ
- Phone:
- 00000 000000
- Email:
- enquiries@bfct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window