KINGDOM OF GOD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL AND MOUNT CARMEL PRAYER ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a number of activities to help build our local community. Social inclusion is key to our work in our efforts to build social cohesion. We work with families, youth , elderly the unemployed, the homeless individuals refugees and the BAME communities to effect changes in their situation. We work through one to one sessions and group session to ensure change is on going.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Brent
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 06 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLLINS ADU KWAKYE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adwoa Serwaa Sarkodie | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA OSEI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.91k | £115.33k | £63.15k | £59.11k | £74.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.58k | £117.22k | £51.89k | £69.33k | £72.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 April 2025 | 519 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 April 2025 | 519 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 April 2025 | 884 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 April 2025 | 884 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2022 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2022 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2022 | 541 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2022 | 541 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ATTACHED STATEMENT OF BELIEF
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KGM Ministries
Unit 9, Tudor Leaf Business Centre
Fountayne Road
London
N15 4QL
- Phone:
- 07564313975
- Email:
- kingdomofgodmins@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window