FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CHURCH BURWASH

Charity Number: 1134556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise and provide funds for the maintenance of St Bartholomews Church Burwash.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,814
Total expenditure: £4,809

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Thomas Pelham Trustee 20 December 2021
THE REVEREND GEORGE BARNSLEY'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CHURCH, BURWASH
Received: On time
Shirley Viney Trustee 30 January 2017
None on record
Ian Kirk Trustee 30 January 2017
None on record
David Thomson Trustee 30 January 2017
None on record
MR CHRIS WOODBURN Trustee
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CHURCH, BURWASH
Received: On time
THE BARKSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £829 £51.23k £18.82k £746 £19.81k
Total expenditure £85 £60.09k £85 £85 £4.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OAK HOUSE
HEATHFIELD ROAD
BURWASH
ETCHINGHAM
TN19 7HN
Phone:
01435883196
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available