OVERCOMER'S FAITH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OFC is a Church focused on spiritual attainment and teaching members the practical steps that can be taken for them to realise their God-given destinies. We believe we are in a time where people need God-inspired practical solutions to life?s challenges. This is the gap this ministry is called to fulfil prayer meetings, educational seminars/lectures and worship service on Sundays
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- Sutton
- Nigeria
Governance
- 22 June 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 September 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE THOMPSON | Trustee | 05 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
GRACE BALOUFITI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.21k | £36.88k | £41.19k | £35.00k | £35.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.50k | £39.50k | £41.41k | £35.49k | £33.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, EDUCATIONAL SEMINARS AND LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. B) TO PROMOTE ANY SUCH OTHER PURPOSES DEEMED CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
OVERCOMERS FAITH CENTRE
Capitol House
662 London Road
Cheam
SUTTON
Surrey
- Phone:
- 02086411565
- Email:
- overcomers_fc@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window