NORTH CHESHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of sacred space (a building) for prayer and contemplation Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£612,288
Donations and legacies | £537.48k | |
Charitable activities | £34.28k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £40.52k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£644,923
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £644.92k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £644.92k |
People

10 Employee(s)
69 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
Governance
- 17 February 2010: Standard registration
- CHESTER AND DELAMERE FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- DELAMERE FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
69 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon John Gresswell | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Levitt | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Emily Telling | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Jayne Doherty | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Arnold Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Peter Fletcher Levitt | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Brett Peate | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Broome | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Heald | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Colin Arthur Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Mary Caine MSc., BA | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Suzanne Marie Sale BSc | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Lawrence Albrighton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rhoda Elisabeth Johnson | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Richards | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Davidson | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Denman Krause MA FRGS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Dr Timothy Stuart Alexander-Macquiban MA, PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kenneth Ellams BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Avis Palmer | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Stacey FCCA | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|||||
RHIAN ANKERS | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Norma Elizabeth Hughes | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Lynda J Gallimore | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Banks | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Terri Ann Dudley | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alison Louise Crookes BA | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Davidson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kenneth Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
DIANE SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Barbara Guile | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ventham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Richardson | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Joseph Robinson | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sian Partington | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Townsend | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Carolynne Maddock | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janice Aitken | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARGARET LANE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leonard Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ford | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTINE MARGARET JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Barnard | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GOUGH | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev RALPH FENNELL | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ROBERTS | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WORRALL | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MORREY | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV NEIL STACEY | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev CLAIRE MOIRA HEALD | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|||||
ALAN HENRY PIMM | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET WARRINGTON | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WARREN BROWN | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KERRIE NATASHA PIMM | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV D GRAHAM EVANS | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANNE GIBSON | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIMON KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEACON JOHN FORESTER CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC GORDON WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN REGINALD DIMELOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr BRUCE COCHRAN LANE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN ANTHONY BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DAVID HOWARD COPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE HASSALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY HASSALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £640.79k | £506.10k | £539.64k | £997.61k | £612.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £630.46k | £615.32k | £591.17k | £680.23k | £644.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £493.29k | £520.50k | £948.28k | £537.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £635.73k | £11.24k | £16.85k | £26.87k | £34.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.60k | £1.58k | £2.29k | £22.45k | £40.52k | |
|
Income - Other | £460 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £630.46k | £615.32k | £591.17k | £680.23k | £644.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £23.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.65m | £1.65m | £1.63m | £2.23m | £2.23m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £20.81k | £20.85k | £47.75k | |
|
Other assets | £724.45k | £608.90k | £573.55k | £743.39k | £683.86k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £136.12k | £131.33k | £147.50k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Office
Helsby Methodist Church
Chester Road
Helsby
WA6 0AQ
- Phone:
- 07311 070950
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window