SOUTHWICK CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles and usages for the time being of Congregationalism and in accordance with any specific requirements in the Foundation Trusts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- West Sussex
- Argentina
- Belgium
- Hungary
- India
- Spain
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES BENKA-COKER | Chair | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Lind | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Byrne | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Edwards | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Dale | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BOX | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.29k | £110.87k | £117.86k | £105.34k | £101.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.66k | £119.35k | £121.96k | £106.13k | £85.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2024 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2023 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2023 | 287 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND USAGE'S FOR THE TIME BEING OF CONGREGATIONALISM AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS IN THE FOUNDATION TRUSTS. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELIEVE NEED AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-5 ROMAN CRESCENT
SOUTHWICK
BRIGHTON
BN42 4TY
- Phone:
- 01273870103
- Email:
- info@southwickchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window