THE NEW NEVILLE PREPARATORY SCHOOL TRUST (GHANA)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to build a new school in Ghana for 350 children. The new school will be located on top of a hill and will have flushing toilets & no flooding.Total cost to build the new school is approx -ú85,000. Neville Maggs & his wife visit the school annually to monitor progress. Every penny collected goes directly towards the cost of building the new school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ghana
Governance
- 05 May 2010: Standard registration
- 23 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30 | £30 | £7.11k | £168 | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.02k | £10.00k | £9.95k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 16 December 2020 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 15 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ASUOYEBOAH-KUMASI REGION OF GHANA BY: FINANCING THE BUILDING OF A SCHOOL AND INFRASTRUCTURE. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL ITEMS AND MATERIALS.
Area of benefit
GHANA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window