Trustees AMP Music Yorkshire

Charity number: 1134287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Asquith Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Callie O'Brien Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
James McPherson Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Benjamin Lee Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Jonathan Gregory Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Helen Beckett Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
Sarah Jane Baumann Trustee 08 July 2019
None on record
Rebecca Lucy Denniff Trustee 08 July 2019
None on record
HELEN DAWSON Trustee 11 December 2017
None on record