NORTH CUMBRIA METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS, COURSES & SMALL GROUPS. PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK & BEREAVED. TAKING RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN LOCAL SCHOOLS. PROMOTING THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH (& AIDING SOCIAL COHESION) THROUGH ACTIVITIES FOR OLDER PEOPLE, PARENTS AND TODDLERS & OTHER SPECIFIC NEED GROUPS. SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK & OVERSEAS FINANCIALLY & WITH PRAYER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

43 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 09 February 2010: Standard registration
- CARLISLE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Newlove | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Philip Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tokunbo Asogbon | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Mark Attwood | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALICE GREGAN | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph John Stobart Pattinson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ELIZABETH GRAY | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lawson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roland Malcolm Lowe | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Louise Wharton | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Kelly | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Oldman | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nan Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Simpson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev GILBERT SYDNEY HALL | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Clare Collinson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Bowron | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Di Armstrong | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Whatmough | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Selby Harrison | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Staley | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ken Holmes | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD BOWRON | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN HUGGON | Trustee | 01 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
MILLIE MCKEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART DENIS WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGERY MALLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATHAN ROBERT PATTINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION PROUDFOOT | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM LITTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGERY LITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ADRIAN MITCHELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEO MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE DRIFFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY CAMPBELL CADDLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND BARON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY LAMB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.31k | £179.52k | £406.72k | £244.71k | £255.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.88k | £223.38k | £296.98k | £322.69k | £345.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
No information available
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Grange Drive
CARLISLE
CA2 6DB
- Phone:
- 01228585295
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window