Accounts and annual returns EMPOWERED TO SUCCEED LTD

Charity number: 1138722
Charity reporting is overdue by 224 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 224 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 224 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 30 August 2024 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 11 October 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required