Financial history ORPHANS OF GHANA

Charity number: 1135404
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £21.71k £11.07k £21.13k £19.46k £9.99k
Total expenditure £21.94k £11.26k £17.93k £13.83k £12.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A