JO'S CERVICAL CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jo's Cervical Cancer Trust (formerly Jo's Trust and set up in 1999) is the only UK charity dedicated to women and their families affected by cervical cancer and cervical abnormalities. We offer a range of online and face to face support to ensure women never feel alone at any stage of their journey. (Jo's Trust accounts can be found in the 'removed charities' section of the Register of Charities.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Total income:
£1,360,286
Donations and legacies | £955.13k | |
Charitable activities | £404.75k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £101 | |
Other | £302 |
Total expenditure:
£1,605,756
Raising funds | £351.05k | |
Charitable activities | £1.25m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £262,899 from 9 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £351.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.25m |
People

23 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 January 2010: Standard registration
- 02 January 2018: Funds received from 1156724 THE RED LIPPY PROJECT
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon James | Chair | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Coggins-Thompson | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Morgan Fitzsimons | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adeola Olaitain | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Sunkaraneni | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rains | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Louise Taylor | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Louise Newton | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50m | £1.63m | £1.90m | £1.61m | £1.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66m | £1.65m | £1.67m | £1.67m | £1.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £157.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £157.90k | £213.04k | £339.11k | £88.76k | £262.90k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £939.81k | £856.32k | £1.38m | £1.52m | £955.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £558.74k | £768.92k | £514.90k | £94.05k | £404.75k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.38k | £1.04k | £1.02k | £202 | £101 | |
|
Income - Other | £3.89k | £4.01k | £1.27k | £294 | £302 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25.43k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.37m | £1.29m | £1.30m | £1.49m | £1.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £293.01k | £361.89k | £370.93k | £171.93k | £351.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.25k | £25.00k | £17.46k | £13.78k | £27.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £7.71k | £8.70k | £4.13k | £5.03k | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £871.87k | £874.58k | £1.34m | £1.13m | £1.05m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £434.93k | £456.03k | £694.29k | £532.72k | £695.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF CERVICAL CANCER; 4.2 TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF CERVICAL CANCER BY SUPPORTING AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND METHOD OF TREATMENT OF THIS DISEASE AND BY PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 4.3 TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CERVICAL CANCER; AND 4.4 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10-18 Union Street
London
SE1 1SZ
- Phone:
- 02038328000
- Email:
- info@jostrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window