Trustees CONCERN AND HELP FOR EAST ELMBRIDGE RETIRED (CHEER)
Charity number: 1133482

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Paul Anthony Mobbs | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Claire Lovett Owen | Trustee | 30 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Victoria Khwaja | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Moss | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Elmer | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janis Fletcher | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN EDWARD RYE | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.