GOSFORTH NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR SETTING IS SITUATED IN THE RURAL VILLAGE OF GOSFORTH IN CUMBRIA. THE NURSERY PROVIDES FULL DAY CARE FOR CHILDREN FROM 4 MONTHS OF AGE, OUT OF SCHOOL SERVICES AND HOLIDAY CLUBS FOR CHILDREN UP TO 11 YEARS OF AGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £121,819 from 1 government contract(s) and £53,328 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 January 2010: Standard registration
- 31 October 2011: Funds received from 1025849 GOSFORTH NURSERY (ACCREDITED)
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Nathan Brooks | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Godwin Oji | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pepita Mary Isabel Ellis | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Risager Wilson Ponting | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Andrew Morris | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.35k | £226.30k | £189.85k | £273.29k | £381.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.19k | £238.33k | £239.44k | £304.04k | £360.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.75k | £79.41k | £78.07k | £72.67k | £121.82k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.25k | £28.81k | £4.29k | £53.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 September 2020 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 September 2020 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 03 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY;- 1. OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gosforth Nursery
Gosforth
SEASCALE
CA20 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01946725800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window