THE DORIS COWDRY (NEE BARNES) CHRISTMAS FUND (3965 118)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. DORIS COWDRY: THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BENEFITS AT CHRISTMAS TO THOSE IN NEED IN THE PARISH OF SUNNINGHILL & ASCOT. 2. FOOD 4 CHILDREN: OPERATES AS A WHOLLY INDEPENDENT ARM OF THE DORIS COWDRY FUND WITH THE CORE AIM OF PROVIDING FAMILIES IN NEED IN THE PARISH WITH WEEKLY FRESH FOOD DELIVERIES TO MAKE SURE THEIR CHILDREN HAVE ACCESS TO NUTRITIOUS, HEALTHY FOOD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 27 April 2010: Standard registration
- Food4Children at Doris Cowdry (Working name)
- THE DORIS COWDRY (NEE BARNES) CHRISTMAS FUND (3965 118) (Working name)
- THE DORIS COWDREY (NEE BARNES) CHRISTMAS FUND (3965 118) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART ANDREW MCNAIR | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE FINCH | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE AMELIA ROBINSON | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £19.84k | £5.67k | £31.87k | £44.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.52k | £22.70k | £4.80k | £19.70k | £21.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION SEALED 29 OCTOBER 2001 as amended on 16 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT IS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTMAS PARTY. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND ARE (2) IF, AND SO FAR AS, THE INCOME CANNOT BE APPLIED FOR THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUBCLAUSE (1) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT FOR: (A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (B) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (I) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (II) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (III) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (C) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (I) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (II) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 St. Marks Road
WINDSOR
Berkshire
SL4 3BD
- Phone:
- 07765 864630
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window