Trustees THE BRAMHALL AND WYTHENSHAWE CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

52 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alistair Stephen Jones Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
John Edwards Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Carole Jeanette Lomax Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Nigel Howard Neary Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Ian Douglas Kennedy Trustee 19 June 2024
WILMSLOW METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Nadine Ibe Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Wai Tik Chan Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
HEATHER VAUX COWARD Trustee 19 February 2024
WILMSLOW METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr Judith Ann Ream Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Spinks Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Anthony Woodside Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Robert Andrew Bartindale Trustee 13 September 2023
CHEADLE HULME METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 197 days late
Wendy Anne Turner Trustee 13 September 2023
CHEADLE HULME METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 197 days late
Margaret Pattie Trustee 13 September 2023
CHEADLE HULME METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 197 days late
Margaret Parker Trustee 13 September 2022
CHEADLE HULME METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 197 days late
Rev IAN WILLIAM SMART Trustee 01 September 2022
UPLIFTING NEPAL'S CHILDREN WITH LOVE AND EDUCATION
Received: On time
LINDOW WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Malcolm John Cockill Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Nicholas Daniel Harding Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Maurice William Turnpenney Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Rev Sarah Jane Parkin Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record