THE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION FOR WEST HAMPSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charitable company working for the benefit of the inhabitants of West Hampstead and providing a Community Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 04 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Eisenbach | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Pearce | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vera Goossens-Kennedy | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timiko Cranwell | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark O'Hanlon | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faith Holland | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manjot Singh Heer | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Healey | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fowler | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pranay Hariharan | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Berridge | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hardwick | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Richards | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MILES SEAMAN | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.58k | £76.02k | £76.26k | £143.03k | £128.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.96k | £71.52k | £79.31k | £96.38k | £124.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.58k | £23.90k | £13.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/2011
Charitable objects
3.1 PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 , ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
WEST HAMPSTEAD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 DORNFELL STREET
LONDON
NW6 1QN
- Phone:
- 02077943729
- Email:
- manager@cawh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window