WIGAN METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Wigan Circuit are mission, mutual encouragement, support, and the effective deployment of the resources of ministry which include people, property and finance. In the Circuit ordained ministers are stationed and Local Preachers are trained and exercise their calling. We fulfil 'Our Calling' as the Methodist Church through worship, learning and caring, service and evangelism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

55 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 17 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
55 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GRAYSON | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||
MARGARET PARKER | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Elaine Ashcroft | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Harrison | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Prosser | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Emrys Ayo Ade-Hall | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Carole Brabrook | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Doris Russell | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John David Owen | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alison Ade-Hall | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Charles Towle | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Owen | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Zanni | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Thomas | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Eddleston | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Winrow | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERYL GLEAVES | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Whelan | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARROWSMITH | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Barrow | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Lord | Trustee | 11 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
AGNES HOUGHTON | Trustee | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Maxwell | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Denise Howarth | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BUDWORTH | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Pilkington | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HUGHES | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SOWERBY | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PORTER | Trustee | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BOLD | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE FLETCHER | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ERNEST JOHNSON | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GARY RICHARD CALLAND | Trustee | 17 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
OLWEN DAVIES CALLAND | Trustee | 17 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND ANNE BARTON | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sharrock | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|||||
RUTH CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALLAN WILCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JOHN CHARLES HILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN WENDY VIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN SEED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN RYLANCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eileen Lisa Smalley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLEN JOHN HOWARTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH VERNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY SELLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN WILLIAM SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ALAN ROBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRIE JOHN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD JOSEPH MC HUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL MARY HOPE LITTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.77k | £553.20k | £541.40k | £475.50k | £230.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.00k | £394.03k | £463.07k | £618.95k | £344.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £231.11k | £204.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £34.49k | £25.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £277.60k | £301.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £390.59k | £459.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £3.44k | £3.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.80k | £1.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £3.44k | £3.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spencer Road Methodist Church
Spencer Road
WIGAN
WN1 2QR
- Phone:
- 01942321328
- Email:
- WiganMethodist@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window