MAJLIS KHUDDAMUL AHMADIYYA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To name just a few we have been collecting blood, planting trees nationwide, visiting several hospitals to meet and greet the sick, providing volunteers to the registered British charitites, serving free meals to the needy, making award payments to deserving students and constantly carrying out educational and sports sessions for the members throughout the country.And a lot more!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£1,396,473
Donations and legacies | £1.00m | |
Charitable activities | £4.97k | |
Other trading activities | £72.23k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £314.49k |
Total expenditure:
£1,450,688
Raising funds | £189.73k | |
Charitable activities | £1.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £189.73k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.26m |
People

2 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 April 2010: Standard registration
- AHMADIYYA MUSLIM YOUTH ASSOCIATION (UK) (Working name)
- AMYA (Working name)
- AMYA (Previous name)
- MAJLIS KHUDDAMUL AHMADIYYA (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL QUDDUS ARIF | Chair | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Saif Ullah Saleem | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabah-ul-Nassar Ahmad | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
TAUSEEF AHMED | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £841.67k | £902.95k | £886.82k | £1.07m | £1.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £826.08k | £505.11k | £735.36k | £1.07m | £1.45m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £808.63k | £817.64k | £818.74k | £929.22k | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £15.84k | £0 | £42.28k | £61.09k | £72.23k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.97k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £546 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £17.21k | £85.31k | £25.80k | £83.91k | £314.49k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £793.97k | £476.79k | £670.07k | £960.88k | £1.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £32.11k | £28.32k | £65.29k | £105.57k | £189.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.30k | £3.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.63k | £20.56k | £13.75k | £11.80k | £4.61k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £635.79k | |
|
Other assets | £316.91k | £639.08k | £824.37k | £949.25k | £732.64k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £91.29k | £12.55k | £39.58k | £154.19k | £620.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/04/2010
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSLIM FAITH WORLD-WIDE AS EXPOUNDED BY HADRAT MIRZA GHULAM AHMAD OF QADIAN, THE PROMISED MESSIAH AND THE FOUNDER OF THE AHMADIYYA MOVEMENT AND INTERPRETED BY ANY OF HIS SUCCESSORS KNOWN AS KHALIFATUL MASIH. THE PRESENT KHALIFATUL MASIH IS HADRAT MIRZA MASROOR AHMAD KHALIFATUL MASIH V. (B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, SEMINARS AND DISCUSSION FORUMS. (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (D)ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aiwan-E-Mahmood
Unit 2
Bourne Mill Business Park
Centre Park
Farnham
Surrey
- Phone:
- 02086877889
- Email:
- maal@khuddam.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window