SANDFORD STATION RAILWAY HERITAGE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF SANDFORD RAILWAY STATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A VISITOR AND HERITAGE CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
Governance
- 09 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE BRENCHLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
GILBERT CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH BALLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LOIS BRENCHLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Trevor Smallwood | Trustee |
|
||||||||
EDWIN THOMAS SANDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/02/2021 | 09/02/2022 | 09/02/2023 | 09/02/2024 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £980 | £4.41k | £8.82k | £10.79k | £10.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.89k | £3.31k | £4.69k | £5.90k | £12.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 February 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 February 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 February 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 February 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 February 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 19 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF SANDFORD RAILWAY STATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A VISITOR AND HERITAGE CENTRE.
Area of benefit
SANDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 THE LYNCH
WINSCOMBE
BS25 1AR
- Phone:
- 01934843868
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window