RCCG ZONE OF RESURRECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is mainly involved in the promotion of Christian faith and the relief of poverty in all mankind. The charity holds weekly meetings to share and teach the virtues of Christianity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 23 June 2010: Standard registration
- THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD: ZONE OF RESURRECTION AND RESTORATION PARISH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADEOLA OLUWAYEMISI EMORDI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mutiatu Dahunsi | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bamikole Abayomi Omobitan | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.90k | £35.58k | £35.05k | £46.58k | £34.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.96k | £24.21k | £21.54k | £42.30k | £22.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 13 June 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 13 June 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2020
(These accounts |
13 June 2022 | 439 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAY 0210 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
3. I. I TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FIN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FRONT TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT: 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS. GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT: AND
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
95B WOOLWICH ROAD
LONDON
SE2 0DY
- Phone:
- 07415133019
- Email:
- OFFICE@RCCGBEXLEYHEATH.ORG
- Website:
-
WWW.RCCGBEXLEYHEATH.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window