HUMAN TRAFFICKING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation supports and adds value to the work of the many charities and agencies operating to combat human trafficking in the UK, through: (i) informing parliamentarians, policy makers and lead statutory agencies; (ii) raising public awareness; and (iii) providing a sustained and collective voice. We do not work in isolation but are guided and informed by the organisations we exist to serve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir John Randall | Chair | 12 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
Lord Richard Irwin Harrington | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rt Hon Karen Bradley MP ACA CTA | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Hon Karen Anne Bradley MP ACA CTA | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
VERNON COAKER | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|||||||
PAUL JACKSON | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||
BARONESS BUTLER SLOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.96k | £273.84k | £211.67k | £147.34k | £170.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.46k | £188.64k | £189.88k | £225.63k | £207.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £64.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE PROMOTION OF AWARENESS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING, ITS CAUSES, MANIFESTATIONS, AND ITS DESTRUCTIVE EFFECTS AND ADVERSE CONSEQUENCES, INCLUDING WITHIN LOCATIONS WHEREVER POTENTIAL VICTIMS MAY ORIGINATE; (B) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING OF ANYONE WHO MAY HAVE BEEN THE VICTIM OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF IMMEDIATE SUPPORT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT SERVICES TO THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING; (C) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER HARDSHIP OF ANYONE WHO MAY HAVE BEEN THE VICTIM OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ASSISTANCE WITH REPATRIATION, HOUSING AND SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY RE-INTEGRATION; (D) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE RESEARCH AND ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT REGARDING ALL ASPECTS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING; (E) TO REDUCE AND ERADICATE HUMAN TRAFFICKING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF MEANS BY WHICH TO COMBAT MODERN SLAVERY; (F) TO COMMENT ON ANY PROPOSED LEGISLATION RELATING TO HUMAN TRAFFICKING; (G) TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO BOTH CENTRAL AND LOCAL GOVERNMENTS, REGIONAL AND INDIVIDUAL POLICE FORCES, BORDER AND IMMIGRATION AGENCIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, WHETHER STATUTORY OR VOLUNTARY; (H) TO PARTNER WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHO HAVE SIMILAR OBJECTIVES AND TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THEIR WORK.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKFRIARS SETTLEMENT
1 Rushworth Street
LONDON
SE1 0RB
- Phone:
- 02037732040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window