DIDIER DROGBA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities included the running of the health centre and the mobile cardiac clinic. The funding and donation of new digital facilities for four schools in the villages of Bassam, Cocody and Bingerville. This equipment provides digitally interactive classrooms for the local children, with computers, interactive whiteboards, internet connection and digital training for local teachers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ivory Coast
Governance
- 23 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIDIER TEBILY YVES DROGBA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Saleef Jermaine Mfor Mpecassah | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline McAteer | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
THIERNO GAYE SEYDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.29k | £77.43k | £68.32k | £1.04k | £9.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.86k | £161.74k | £2.78k | £57.92k | £3.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 214 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 January 2023 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2019
(These accounts |
18 December 2020 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 19 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE AS FOLLOWS: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE IVORY COAST
Area of benefit
IVORY COAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O THE SPORT PR COMPANY
25 Newman Street
1st Floor
LONDON
W1T 1PN
- Phone:
- 02074343392
- Email:
- info@thesportsprcompany.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window