Accounts and annual returns BROMBOROUGH U3A (UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE)

Charity number: 1133569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 October 2020 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required