Financial history BROMBOROUGH U3A (UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE)

Charity number: 1133569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.19k £4.55k £33 £2.08k £2.38k
Total expenditure £5.79k £3.41k £1.84k £2.26k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A