Financial history WERRINGTON JOGGERS

Charity Number: 1136937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.80k £2.22k £7.82k £10.74k £14.66k
Total expenditure £1.29k £1.84k £9.04k £7.94k £13.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A