Trustees WERRINGTON JOGGERS
Charity Number: 1136937

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Roderick William McDonald | Chair | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Harrall | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thomas Campbell Graham | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Arran Crosby | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Turner | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chas Robert Campen | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Gay Sefton | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Frances Gay Hunt | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Revell | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann DIVER | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY PAUL COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ANN MERRITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM CHARLES JACKLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.