THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF CAVERSHAM THAMESIDE AND MAPLEDURHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective the PCC is to promote in the Parish the whole mission of the Church; pastoral, evangelical, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
Governance
- 22 January 2010: Standard registration
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST PETER CAVERSHAM AND ST MARGARET MAPLEDURHAM (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mike Smith | Chair | 21 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Curtis | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Catherine Radcliffe | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Neil Porter | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Woodham | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Macgregor | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toni Kathleen Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francis Peter Serjeant | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Spencer | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeyasingh John Samuel | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Edward Wheeler | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Purkis | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Kavanagh | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Caroline Harlow | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Wisdom | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE TAYLOR | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stratton | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Penny Cuthbert | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachel Ross Smith | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL BLACKBURN | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £363.79k | £292.81k | £699.87k | £341.55k | £414.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.46k | £299.36k | £315.15k | £347.79k | £429.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £550.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £29.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £16.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £94.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £376.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £314.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £917 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £12.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/06/2010
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HOUSE
59 CHURCH STREET
CAVERSHAM
READING
RG4 8AX
- Phone:
- 01189968836
- Email:
- ADMIN@CTMPARISH.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
ctmparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window