GRACE BAPTIST PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the religious and other charitable work of Grace Baptist churches by providing training, practical experience, resources and materials to persons involved in establishing new Grace Baptist churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Germany
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Scotland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 22 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chola Mukanga | Chair | 28 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Thomas Quested Forryan | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin Wong | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP MARK WOODLEY | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.71k | £247.51k | £302.29k | £274.56k | £379.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £465.85k | £211.13k | £255.94k | £276.08k | £395.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JANUARY 2010 as amended on 12 Dec 2016 as amended on 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THAT PART OR SECTION OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION KNOWN AS GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES HOLDING TO THE DOCTRINAL BASIS SPECIFIED IN CLAUSE 4, BY; 1 PROVIDING TRAINING, PRACTICAL EXPERIENCE, RESOURCES AND MATERIALS TO PERSONS INVOLVED IN ESTABLISHING NEW GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES. 2 PROVIDING MATERIALS THAT WOULD BE USEFUL TO THE WORSHIP AND WITNESS OF NEW GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES. 3 PROVIDING RESEARCH AND ASSESSMENT SERVICES FOR THOSE CONSIDERING ESTABLISHING NEW GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES. 4 PROVIDING BIBLICAL COUNSEL TO GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES AND PERSONS INVOLVED IN ESTABLISHING NEW GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Manse
Palmerston Road
LONDON
SW19 1PQ
- Phone:
- 07958282886
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window