EXERCISING FOR MOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exercising for Mobility's aims are to provide fun and affordable Chair-Based Fitness Sessions for everyone, but especially for people with physical or mental health issues of any kind, and also to provide varied social opportunities for its Members at a time when many elderly people feel lonely and isolated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 19 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Ann PAWLEY | Chair | 08 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Margaret Head | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Jewell | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Geoffrey North | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Bickerstaff | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Anne Powell | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Dixon | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Barling | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bickle | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zinnia Symonds | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.70k | £48.95k | £46.24k | £32.77k | £19.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.83k | £28.15k | £28.80k | £33.74k | £40.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2010 as amended on 10 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BUDE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF CHAIR-BASED FITNESS SESSIONS AVAILABLE TO EVERYONE, BUT WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS FOR THOSE WITH PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, INCLUDING DEGENERATIVE DISORDERS SUCH AS PARKINSON?S OR MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, OR OTHER LIMITED MOBILITY.
Area of benefit
BUDE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Furze Mead
Poundstock
Bude
Cornwall
EX23 0EE
- Phone:
- 07747 853980
- Email:
- japawley56@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window