Financial history AMAZING GRACE MINISTRIES ( KINGDOM CENTRE)

Charity number: 1136919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.12k £19.43k £15.74k £14.63k £19.31k
Total expenditure £22.37k £21.60k £13.76k £14.47k £12.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.01k N/A N/A N/A