COVENTRY RESOURCE CENTRE FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of people affected by blindness, partial sight or other disabling diseases of the eye. Provision in the interests of social welfare of recreational and educational facilities for such people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £31,863 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 01 March 2010: Standard registration
- 16 March 2023: Funds received from 505642 COMMUNITY BROADCASTING SERVICES (COVENTRY)
- Coventry Vision Hub (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH JOHN TAYLOR | Chair | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Julian Aubrey Ballinger | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Frank Horspool | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Anthony Stanley Fossey | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|||||
SURESH MUNYAL | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK CHRISTOPHER GALVIN | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN OTTERAN YOUNG | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.77k | £235.66k | £181.26k | £272.70k | £290.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.98k | £167.66k | £178.55k | £235.44k | £257.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.09k | £37.64k | N/A | £31.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY BLINDNESS, PARTIAL SIGHT OR OTHER DISABLING DISEASES OF THE EYE. 2. THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE. 3. THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL DISTRESS OF SUCH PEOPLE OR OF THEIR DEPENDANTS OR OF THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED PEOPLE. 4. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ALL DISEASES OF THE EYE ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 EARLSDON AVENUE SOUTH
COVENTRY
CV5 6TH
- Phone:
- 02476717522
- Email:
- admin@crcb.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window