Change a Child's Life

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To promote the benefit of people living in and around Nairobi, Kenya, by: (a) the advancement of education and training; (b) the relief of poverty and-?sickness; (c) the promotion of good health. 2) To advance in life and help young people through the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
Governance
- 29 April 2010: Standard registration
- CHANGE A CHILD'S LIFE (Working name)
- THE MAURICE GLAYZER CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL KENNY | Trustee |
|
||||||
LISA MARIA BROCKLEBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.37k | £61.41k | £84.15k | £80.07k | £86.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.48k | £50.62k | £91.75k | £83.34k | £80.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2024
(These accounts |
15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 2009 as amended on 01 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN AND AROUND NAIROBI, KENYA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE ATTENDING THE MARIA IMMACULATE CHILDREN'S EDUCATION CENTRE FOR POOR CHILDREN AND ST. MONICA CHILDREN'S HOME FOR ORPHANS BY 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; 3.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH. 3.2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NAIROBI, KENYA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WOODBURN DRIVE
WIRRAL
CH60 8QG
- Phone:
- 07736937971
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window