CROWBOROUGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and secure the establishment of a community centre in Crowborough and to manage and maintain it whether alone or in conjunction with any local authority or other person or body in order that individuals and groups achieve their potential, share experiences and expertise, overcome barriers and build an integrated and supportive community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 11 February 2010: Standard registration
- 10 May 2011: Funds received from 305195 CROWBOROUGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- CROWBOROUGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION - 2010 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chantal Francoise Wilson | Chair |
|
||||||
Carolyn Jane Huntington Clark | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Somers | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Suter | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ellefsen | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.06k | £164.14k | £126.07k | £154.73k | £177.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.66k | £243.74k | £214.14k | £224.74k | £236.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £82.24k | £54.90k | £9.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 24 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF CROWBOROUGH AND THE CIVIL PARISHES OF BUXTED, ROTHERFIELD AND WITHYHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR ON CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES; (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
CROWBOROUGH AND THE CIVIL PARISHES OF BUXTED, ROTHERFIELD AND WITHYHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Crowborough Centre
Pine Grove
Crowborough Common
CROWBOROUGH
TN6 1FE
- Phone:
- 01892653823
- Email:
- info@crowboroughcentre.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window