Trustees THE FAN CHARITY
Charity number: 1134900
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William George Donald Sargeant | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Booty | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Morris | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Kanyeihamba | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Huda Hashim Mustafa Khirelsied | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jones | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomson | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Tooby | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER AKERS | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.