SEAFORTH HIGHLANDERS PIPES & DRUMS, LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Originating from the Seaforth Highlanders Regimental Association, Leicester, where the regiment recruited widely during both world wars. Today the band exists to honour and remember those men of Leicestershire who served in the regiment and those died in conflict and to promote the education of the public in the highland arts, namely piping, drumming and highland dancing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Bozon | Trustee | 10 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CONSTANCE BOZON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL BOZON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £1.69k | £2.60k | £4.26k | £5.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £2.66k | £2.66k | £2.32k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 December 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION REVISED 12 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, DEEDS AND TRADITIONS OF THE SEAFORTH HIGHLANDERS AND THEIR HISTORIC CONNECTION WITH LEICESTERSHIRE. (2) THE PROMOTION, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HIGHLAND ARTS INCLUDING PIPING, DRUMMING AND DANCING. (3) THE COMMEMORATION AND REMEMBRANCE OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE SEAFORTH HIGHLANDERS WHO DIED WHILST IN SERVICE AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF PUBLIC RECOGNITION OF THE SACRIFICE MADE BY SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 STATION ROAD
COUNTESTHORPE
LEICESTER
LE8 5TB
- Phone:
- 0775 8241432
- Email:
- stevebozon@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window