Financial history GATEWAY CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1136007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £591.00k £628.09k £594.18k £637.66k £747.48k
Total expenditure £563.63k £592.30k £647.26k £641.27k £626.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.19k £42.46k N/A £3.71k
Income - Donations and legacies £591.00k £623.95k £571.14k £630.66k £726.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £4.15k £2.55k £7.00k £16.96k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £20.49k £0 £3.71k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £563.63k £589.74k £643.68k £637.11k £615.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.63k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.56k £3.58k £4.16k £9.22k