LUNG CANCER SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support and help to Lung Cancer sufferers and their carerers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2010: Standard registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £554 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 26 January 2013 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 28 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LUNG CANCER AND OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR THE ACQUISITION OF SPECIALIST MEDICAL FACILITIES; AND (B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED WITH THE TREATMENT OF LUNG CANCER BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR (I) TRAINING NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE RELEVANT LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY AND (II) RESEARCH INTO LUNG CANCER TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window